2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 131

File Code: Environment Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 103
Sponsored By:
Delegate Bobo and the Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Busch, V. Clagett, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Haynes, Heller, Lawton, Lee, Malone, McIntosh, Niemann, Taylor, F. Turner, Ali, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Branch, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Davis, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Harrison, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, Kirk, Kramer, Krysiak, Kullen, Lafferty, Levi, Love, Manno, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Rosenberg, Ross, Schuh, Schuler, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and Walker
Entitled:
Maryland Clean Cars Act of 2007

Synopsis:

Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Motor Vehicle Administration, to adopt regulations by December 31, 2007, to establish a low emissions vehicle program applicable to specified vehicles; authorizing a modification concerning the applicability of the program to vehicles of specified model years; requiring the Department to establish motor vehicle emissions standards and compliance requirements; prohibiting the Department or any other State Agency from adopting a specified regulation; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
1/24
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/25
Hearing 2/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/15
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kach) Withdrawn
Special Order 2/16 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2/16
Special Order later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/20
Third Reading Passed (122-16)
3/30
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
2/22
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-9)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 112

Sponsored by:

Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Administration
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Charles Barkley, District 39
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Kumar P. Barve, District 17
Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Talmadge Branch, District 45
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Michael E. Busch, District 30
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Dereck E. Davis, District 25
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Jim Gilchrist, District 17
Delegate Cheryl Glenn, District 45
Delegate Ana Sol Gutierrez, District 18
Delegate Guy Guzzone, District 13
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Hattie N. Harrison, District 45
Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Henry B. Heller, District 19
Delegate Sheila E. Hixson, District 20
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Adrienne A. Jones, District 10
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Ruth M. Kirk, District 44
Delegate Benjamin F. Kramer, District 19
Delegate Carolyn J. Krysiak, District 46
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Jane E. Lawton, District 18
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Gerron Levi, District 23A
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate James E. Malone, Jr., District 12A
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Heather Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate John A. Olszewski, Jr., District 6
Delegate Joseline Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr., District 27A
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Steven R. Schuh, District 31
Delegate Todd Schuler, District 8
Delegate Luiz R. S. Simmons, District 17
Speaker, The
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11
Delegate Melvin Stukes, District 44
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Herman L. Taylor, Jr., District 14
Delegate Frank S. Turner, District 13
Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26
Delegate Jeff Waldstreicher, District 18
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Energy Matters -see also- Fuel; Power Plants; Solar Energy
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Federal Government
Fuel -see also- Coal
Interstate Affairs
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Titles
Warranties

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Environment
( 2-1101 , 2-1102 , 2-1103 , 2-1104 , 2-1105 , 2-1106 , 2-1107 , 2-1108 )
Transportation
( 13-110 , 13-406 , 23-202 , 23-206.3 , 23-206.4 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 203526/02     Offered on: February 16, 2007   at: 11:22 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 920413/01     Offered on: February 15, 2007   at: 10:12 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 963223/01     Offered on: February 15, 2007   at: 10:27 a.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Senate
Number: 908374/01     Offered on: April 3, 2007   at: 11:20 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 20, 2007: Third Reading Passed (122-16)
March 30, 2007: Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Senate
March 31, 2007: Third Reading Passed (38-9)