2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 868

File Code: Transportation - Generally Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 463
Sponsored By:
Delegates Haynes, Anderson, Aumann, Bronrott, Carter, Conaway, DeBoy, Doory, Frank, Glenn, Hucker, James, Kirk, Krysiak, McHale, Montgomery, Oaks, Rice, Rosenberg, Shewell, Stukes, and Tarrant
Entitled:
Maryland Transit Administration - Public Hearings

Synopsis:

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to hold a public hearing before changing a specified bus or rail route alignment, or before establishing or abandoning a rail transit station; limiting the time period during which the Administration may implement a specified change; establishing specified notice requirements; requiring a public hearing to be at a specified location and time; requiring the People's Counsel to appear at public hearings called by the Administration; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/9
First Reading Environmental Matters
2/12
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
3/30
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/23
First Reading Finance
3/27
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/17
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 630

Sponsored by:

Delegate Keith E. Haynes, District 44
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Susan L. M. Aumann, District 42
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Jill P. Carter, District 41
Delegate Frank M. Conaway, Jr., District 40
Delegate Steven J. DeBoy, Sr., District 12A
Delegate Ann Marie Doory, District 43
Delegate William J. Frank, District 42
Delegate Cheryl Glenn, District 45
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Mary-Dulany James, District 34A
Delegate Ruth M. Kirk, District 44
Delegate Carolyn J. Krysiak, District 46
Delegate Brian K. McHale, District 46
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Tanya Shewell, District 5A
Delegate Melvin Stukes, District 44
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Buses -see also- School Buses
Hearings
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Notices
Ombudsmen
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Railroads

Bill affects the following Statute:

Transportation
( 7-506 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 180915/01     Offered on: March 23, 2007   at: 5:06 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 767071/01     Offered on: April 3, 2007   at: 11:43 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2007: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
March 30, 2007: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
March 31, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)