2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1288

File Code: Business Regulation and Occupations Prior Year Introduction As: HB 558/01 - ECM
Sponsored By:
Delegates Vaughn, Davis, Feldman, Hucker, Manno, Proctor, Ramirez, Ross, and Valderrama
Entitled:
State Real Estate Commission - Sales Agents for Home Builders - Licensure

Synopsis:

Requiring individuals who sell any real estate as sales agents for home builders to be licensed by the State Real Estate Commission; and altering the definition of "provide real estate brokerage services" to include selling any real estate as a sales agent for a home builder.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/23
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5
Re-referred Economic Matters
3/7
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
4/5
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/23
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/27
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/1
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 4/6 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted
4/2
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (33-14)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 274

Sponsored by:

Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24
Delegate Dereck E. Davis, District 25
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr., District 27A
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condominiums; Mobile Homes
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Business Occupations and Professions
( 17-101 , 17-101 , 17-207 , 17-301 , 17-322 , 17-322 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 623095/01     Offered on: March 22, 2007   at: 11:39 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 644333/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 10:25 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2007: Third Reading Passed (135-1)
April 5, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Senate
April 2, 2007: Favorable with Amendments Adopted (33-14)
April 3, 2007: Third Reading Passed (34-13)