2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 396

File Code: Real Property Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 463
Sponsored By:
Senators Gladden, Della, Conway, Jones, McFadden, Pugh, Frosh, and Stone
Entitled:
Ground Rents - Remedies for Nonpayment of Ground Rent

Synopsis:

Applying provisions of law authorizing a landlord under a ground lease to bring an action for ejectment for nonpayment of ground rent to specified property; repealing provisions of law entitling the holder of a ground rent to reimbursement for expenses incurred in collecting past due ground rent and filing an action for ejectment; providing that the establishment of a lien is the remedy for nonpayment of a ground rent on specified residential property; establishing procedures for imposing and releasing a lien; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/2
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/20
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Garagiola) Adopted
3/21
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Klausmeier)
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/19
First Reading Environmental Matters
3/27
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 286

Sponsored by:

Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Circuit Courts
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Eviction
Foreclosure
Forms
Hearings
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Land Records -see also- Deeds
Leases and Rent
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Notices
Real Property

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Real Property
( 8-111.1 , 8-111.2 , 8-402.2 , 8-402.3 , 8-402.3 , 14-108.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 213120/01     Offered on: March 21, 2007   at: 6:05 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 928475/01     Offered on: March 21, 2007   at: 6:05 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 450612/01     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 10:33 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 22, 2007: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
March 31, 2007: Third Reading Passed (139-0)