2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 519

File Code: Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 571
Sponsored By:
Senators Peters, Brochin, Jacobs, McFadden, Muse, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Simonaire, and Stone
Entitled:
Truancy - Prohibition Against Issuance of Learner's Instructional Permit

Synopsis:

Requiring specified applicants for a learner's instructional permit to present to the Motor Vehicle Administration the applicant's school attendance record; and prohibiting the Administration from issuing a learner's instructional permit to specified applicants if the applicant's school attendance record indicates more than 10 unexcused absences during the prior school semester.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/2
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/20
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Lenett) Adopted
3/21
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 3/22 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
3/23
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
4/2
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Senate Requests House Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Senators Brochin, Muse, and Jacobs
4/4
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
4/6
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/23
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/3
Re-referred Judiciary
Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)
4/5
House Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Delegates Rosenberg, Levi, and McComas
4/6
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/17
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 562

Sponsored by:

Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Jim Brochin, District 42
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Circuit Courts
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Students
Teachers
Truancy

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 7-301 )
Transportation
( 16-105 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 213629/01     Offered on: March 26, 2007   at: 4:19 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 438271/01     Offered on: March 26, 2007   at: 4:19 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 893829/01     Offered on: March 26, 2007   at: 4:22 p.m.     Status: Rejected
House
Number: 472913/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 11:42 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents (Displayed in PDF Format):
Report Number: 233327/1     Offered on: April 9, 2007   at: 10:58 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 25, 2007: Third Reading Passed (38-9)
April 4, 2007: Third Reading Passed (38-9)
House
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-3)
April 6, 2007: Third Reading Passed (138-2)