2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 566

File Code: Utility Regulation Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 1072
Sponsored By:
Senators Miller, Astle, Garagiola, Kelley, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Pugh
Entitled:
Public Utility Companies - Generating Stations - Wind

Synopsis:

Exempting a specified person from having to obtain a certificate of public convenience and necessity for a generating station that produces electricity from wind; requiring a person to obtain approval from the Public Service Commission prior to any construction of a generating station that produces electricity from wind under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to provide a specified opportunity for public comment; requiring the Commission to report on specified matters to specified persons; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/2
First Reading Finance
2/14
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/24
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/22
First Reading Economic Matters
3/29
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-14)
Action after passage in Senate and House
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 163

Sponsored by:

Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Construction
Energy Matters -see also- Fuel; Power Plants; Solar Energy
Hearings
Notices
Power Plants
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
Sunset
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Public Utility Companies
( 7-207 , 7-207.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 677270/01     Offered on: March 23, 2007   at: 11:56 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 483592/02     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 10:28 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 24, 2007: Third Reading Passed (42-4)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (40-6)
House
March 31, 2007: Third Reading Passed (124-14)