2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 606

File Code: Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Sponsored By:
Senators Forehand, Conway, Kelley, Kramer, Pugh, Raskin, Rosapepe, Brochin, Gladden, Haines, Jacobs, Mooney, Muse, Simonaire, Stone, Jones, and Peters
Entitled:
Human Trafficking, Extortion, and Involuntary Servitude

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a person from knowingly soliciting specified persons for prostitution; prohibiting a person from obtaining or attempting to obtain labor or services by specified means; establishing that a specified penalty is based on the value of specified labor or services; prohibiting a person from making specified verbal threats with the intent to unlawfully extort labor or services; providing that the District Court has jurisdiction that is concurrent with a circuit court in specified criminal cases involving human trafficking; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/2
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order later today (Senator V. Jones) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator V. Jones) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Peters) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/15
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/16
First Reading Judiciary
3/21
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 340

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Jim Brochin, District 42
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Aliens
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Traders; etc
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
District Courts
Human Rights
Identification
Jurisdiction
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Nudity and Sexual Displays -see also- Obscenity; Pornography
Penalties
Prostitution
Solicitation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings
( 4-301 , 4-301 , 4-302 )
Criminal Law
( 3-324 , 3-701 , 3-704 , 3-705 , 11-303 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 348272/01     Offered on: March 13, 2007   at: 11:47 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 473321/01     Offered on: March 13, 2007   at: 11:48 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 963322/01     Offered on: March 13, 2007   at: 11:50 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 832715/01     Offered on: April 4, 2007   at: 10:38 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 15, 2007: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
March 30, 2007: Third Reading Passed (140-0)