2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 678

File Code: Human Relations Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 314
Sponsored By:
Senators Raskin, Britt, Della, Frosh, Gladden, Pinsky, and Conway
Entitled:
Maryland Human Relations Commission - Hearings and Civil Actions - Relief

Synopsis:

Altering provisions of the Maryland Human Relations Commission law; requiring specified cases to be heard by an administrative law judge, rather than a hearing examiner; requiring that a complaint of discrimination and specified documents be certified to the general counsel of the Commission rather than the Commission chairman; altering the circumstances under which a certification is required to be made; expanding the relief available for specified acts of discrimination; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
2/2
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/7
Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Special Order later today (Senator Harris) Adopted
3/23
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/20
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/28
Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/31
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-3)
Action after passage in Senate and House
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 176

Sponsored by:

Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Gwendolyn Britt, District 47
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Hearings, Office of
Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Damages
Discrimination
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Hearings
Human Relations Commission
Judges
Juries -see also- Grand Juries
Notices
Trials
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 49B Human Relations Commission
( 11 , 11A , 11B , 11C , 11D )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 628270/01     Offered on: March 20, 2007   at: 12:24 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 196486/01     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 10:45 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 23, 2007: Third Reading Passed (39-8)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (39-8)
House
March 31, 2007: Third Reading Passed (136-3)