2007 Regular Session

Clerks of Court

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 13

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 158

    Status as of March 12, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Calvert County Delegation
    Entitled
    Business Regulation - Licenses - Calvert County
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 207

    Status as of March 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Smigiel, Dwyer, George, Jennings, Jones, McComas, McDonough, Myers, Riley, Shank, and Sossi
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 384

    Status as of February 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Conaway
    Entitled
    Baltimore City Circuit Court - Jury Commissioner - Designation and Supervision
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Sponsored By
    Delegates Simmons, Olszewski, Vallario, Rosenberg, Anderson, Barnes, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Dwyer, Frank, Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Levi, McComas, Ramirez, Schuler, Smigiel, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Civil Actions - Liability of Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 497

    Status as of March 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Prince George's County Delegation
    Entitled
    Prince George's County - Courts - Docketing Fee for Appearance of Counsel - Payment and Collection PG 316-07
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 653

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 247

    Sponsored By
    Prince George's County Delegation
    Entitled
    Prince George's County - Marriage License Fee - Increase PG 411-07
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1029

    Status as of March 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Taylor, Holmes, and Krebs
    Entitled
    Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Civil Court Cases - Filing Fees
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1126

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Frush
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Delinquent Motor Vehicle Theft Offenses - License Suspension
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1134

    Status as of April 5, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Conaway
    Entitled
    Marriage - Performance of Ceremony - Retired Clerk of Court
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 164

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 522

    Sponsored By
    Senators Miller and Dyson
    Entitled
    Business Regulation - Licenses - Calvert County
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Economic Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 389

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 150

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stone
    Entitled
    Civil Actions - Liability of Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 488

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 159

    Sponsored By
    Senators Britt, Conway, Currie, Gladden, Kelley, Pugh, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Voter Registration Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 880

    Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules

    Sponsored By
    Senator Zirkin
    Entitled
    Marriage - Performance of Ceremony - Retired Clerk of Court
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Senate Rules