2007 Regular Session

Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 15

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 78

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Cardin
    Entitled
    Environmental Tobacco Smoke Elimination and Waiver Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 359

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 502

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frush, Ali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Bobo, Braveboy, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Carter, V. Clagett, Doory, Dumais, Elmore, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Goldwater, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kach, N. King, Krebs, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Rosenberg, Ross, Schuh, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Taylor, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 449

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 407

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Feldman
    Entitled
    Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Vehicle Protection Products Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 926

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Rosenberg
    Entitled
    Job Skills Advancement Training Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 998

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Krysiak, Ali, Anderson, Bobo, Burns, Feldman, Hucker, Kirk, Love, Manno, McHale, McIntosh, Minnick, Taylor, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Maryland Tax Preparers Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 999

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate McConkey
    Entitled
    Real Property - Common Ownership Community Ombudsman
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1031

    Status as of April 10, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 51

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Taylor (Unemployment Insurance Oversight Committee)
    Entitled
    Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1055

    Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Oaks, Branch, Cane, Costa, Glenn, Haddaway, Haynes, Holmes, Hubbard, Ivey, Krysiak, Kullen, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Rosenberg, Tarrant, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Workforce Development Pilot Program for Lead Abatement and Removal
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 91

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 501

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Britt, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones, Kelley, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 288

    Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Kelley and Currie
    Entitled
    Real Property - Common Ownership Community Ombudsman
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 513

    Status as of February 27, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senators Della, Frosh, Lenett, Pugh, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Maryland Tax Preparers Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 541

    Status as of February 26, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Klausmeier and Stone
    Entitled
    Maryland Vessel Gaming Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 720

    Status as of April 10, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 50

    Sponsored By
    Senators Middleton, Exum, and Kelley (Unemployment Insurance Oversight Committee)
    Entitled
    Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 778

    Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Pugh
    Entitled
    Job Skills Advancement Training Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 1033

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 370

    Sponsored By
    Senator Currie
    Entitled
    Tax Credits for Individuals Facing Employment Barriers - Sunset Extension
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Ways and Means