2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 62

File Code: Public Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 97
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hubbard, Hammen, Pendergrass, Beitzel, Benson, Bromwell, Costa, Donoghue, Elliott, Kach, Kipke, Kullen, McDonough, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Riley, Tarrant, V. Turner, and Weldon
Entitled:
Lead-Containing Children's Products - Prohibition

Synopsis:

Prohibiting the manufacture, sale, offer for sale, importation, or distribution of specified lead-containing children's products by any means, including through a sales outlet or the Internet; providing that provisions of the Act do not apply to specified electronic devices, specified distribution operations or activities, or specified vehicles, products, parts, or equipment; requiring the Department of the Environment to give notices under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
11/15
Pre-filed
1/9
First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/16
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/27
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/29
Third Reading Passed (132-4)
4/4
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/3
First Reading Finance & Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/17
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Rejected (12-35)
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/3
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/13
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 483

Sponsored by:

Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Wendell R. Beitzel, District 1A
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Heather R. Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Traders; etc
Comptroller
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Disclosure
Environment, Department of
Fines
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Penalties
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Toys
Unfair Trade Practices

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Commercial Law
( 13-301 )
Environment
( 6-1301 , 6-1302 , 6-1303 , 6-1304 , 6-1305 , 6-1306 , 6-1307 , 6-1308 , 6-1309 , 6-1310 , 6-1311 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 916286/01     Offered on: February 27, 2008   at: 10:22 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 197477/01     Offered on: April 5, 2008   at: 2:40 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 29, 2008: Third Reading Passed (132-4)
Senate
April 2, 2008: Committee Amendment {197477/1 Rejected (12-35)
April 3, 2008: Third Reading Passed (43-4)