2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 257

File Code: Health Care Facilities and Regulation Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 725
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kullen, Elliott, Kipke, Rudolph, Beitzel, Benson, Bromwell, Costa, Donoghue, Hammen, Kach, McDonough, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Riley, V. Turner, and Weldon
Entitled:
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts with Pharmacies and Pharmacists

Synopsis:

Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to disclose specified information to a pharmacy or pharmacist at the time of entering into a contract with the pharmacy or pharmacist and also at a specified time before a contract change; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to establish a process for review of a failure to pay the contractual reimbursement amount of specified claims; making provisions of law applicable to health maintenance organizations; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/23
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/18
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/19
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/21
First Reading Finance
3/25
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 262

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Wendell R. Beitzel, District 1A
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate David D. Rudolph, District 34B
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Auditors and Audits
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Disclosure
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Insurance Administration
Notices
Penalties
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Restitution
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 19-706 )
Insurance
( 15-1601 , 15-1602 , 15-1603 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 276182/01     Offered on: March 21, 2008   at: 10:56 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 547774/01     Offered on: April 5, 2008   at: 2:44 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 19, 2008: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
April 4, 2008: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Senate
April 3, 2008: Third Reading Passed (47-0)