2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 795

File Code: Business Regulation and Occupations Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 649
Sponsored By:
Delegates Reznik, Ali, Cardin, Conaway, Davis, Feldman, Frick, Haddaway, Hammen, Ivey, Kaiser, King, Kipke, Manno, Rice, Schuler, Taylor, Vaughn, and Walker
Entitled:
Athletics - Mixed Martial Arts - Regulation by State Athletic Commission - Boxing and Wrestling Tax

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a person from participating as a mixed martial arts contestant in a contest in the State unless the person has a license issued by the State Athletic Commission; exempting specified amateur mixed martial arts from the requirements of the Act under specified circumstances; requiring a mixed martial arts contestant licensee to be examined by a physician under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for a mixed martial arts contestant license or licensee to provide documentary evidence about medical test results; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/6
First Reading Economic Matters
2/13
Hearing 3/5 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/24
Third Reading Passed (117-22)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (109-27)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Senate Rules
4/1
Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-11)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 608

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Frank M. Conaway, Jr., District 40
Delegate Dereck E. Davis, District 25
Delegate Brian J. Feldman, District 15
Delegate C. William Frick, District 16
Delegate Jeannie Haddaway, District 37B
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate James J. King, District 33A
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Todd Schuler, District 8
Delegate Herman L. Taylor, Jr., District 14
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

AIDS
Athletic Commission, State
Chemical Tests
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Examinations
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Gross Receipts Tax
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Penalties
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Sports -see also- Recreation; Stadiums

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Business Regulation
( 4-101 , 4-301 , 4-302 , 4-303 , 4-304 , 4-304.1 , 4-305 , 4-308 , 4-310 , 4-314 , 4-315 , 4-316 , 4-320 , 4-321 )
Tax - General
( 6-101 , 6-102 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 343298/01     Offered on: March 26, 2008   at: 10:22 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 494038/01     Offered on: April 5, 2008   at: 1:51 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 24, 2008: Third Reading Passed (117-22)
April 4, 2008: Third Reading Passed (109-27)
Senate
April 3, 2008: Third Reading Passed (36-11)