2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1140

File Code: Health Occupations Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 889
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kullen, Eckardt, Hammen, Pendergrass, Benson, Donoghue, Elliott, Hubbard, Kach, Kipke, McDonough, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Riley, Tarrant, V. Turner, and Weldon
Entitled:
Nurse Practitioners - Authority to Certify

Synopsis:

Authorizing a nurse practitioner to certify that a specified minor is pregnant or has given birth under specified circumstances; authorizing a nurse practitioner or a nurse midwife to provide specified information about the birth of a child for purposes of filing a birth certificate; authorizing a nurse practitioner to complete and sign a specified death certificate under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/7
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/13
Hearing 3/5 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Special Order after Third Reading calendar (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 233

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Adelaide C. Eckardt, District 37B
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Heather R. Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Advance Medical Directives
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Emergencies
Estates and Trusts
Guardians
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Insects -see also- Bees
License Plates
Marriage
Mental Health
Nurses
Pregnancy
Vital Records

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Family Law
( 2-301 )
Health - General
( 4-208 , 4-212 , 5-601 , 5-601 , 5-601 , 5-602 , 5-602 , 5-608 , 10-628 , 13-701 , 13-704 )
Transportation
( 13-616 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 526786/01     Offered on: March 22, 2008   at: 11:49 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 694838/01     Offered on: April 5, 2008   at: 1:58 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 20, 2008: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
April 4, 2008: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Senate
April 3, 2008: Third Reading Passed (46-0)