2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 554

File Code: Environment Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 176
Sponsored By:
Senators Lenett, Conway, Currie, Della, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, and Robey
Entitled:
Chesapeake Bay Nitrogen Reduction Act of 2009

Synopsis:

Prohibiting the installation of an on-site sewage disposal system in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area to service a newly constructed building, and prohibiting the replacement of an on- site sewage disposal system in the Area, unless the system utilizes nitrogen removal technology; requiring the Department of the Environment to assist homeowners in paying for specified costs under specified circumstances; establishing penalties and enforcement mechanisms; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/5
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/11
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/18
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Stoltzfus) Adopted
3/19
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 3/24 (Senator Stoltzfus) Adopted
3/24
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-20)
Special Order 3/25 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
3/25
Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs)
Special Order 3/26 (Senator Stoltzfus) Adopted
3/26
Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs)
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (17-30)
Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) Adopted (30-15)
Floor Amendment (Senator Stoltzfus) Rejected (22-24)
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (20-27)
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) Adopted (28-19)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/28
Third Reading Passed (24-23)
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Exum) Rejected (22-25)
4/8
Returned Passed
House Action
3/27
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/2
Re-referred Environmental Matters
Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/5
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/6
Floor Amendment (Delegate Jennings) Rejected (43-87)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Stifler) Rejected (44-88)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 280

Sponsored by:

Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer, District 12
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Exemptions
Grants
Income Tax
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Penalties
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Water

Bill affects the following Statute:

Environment
( 9-1108 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 213729/01     Offered on: March 26, 2009   at: 1:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 324537/01     Offered on: March 24, 2009   at: 10:19 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 344430/03     Offered on: March 26, 2009   at: 12:27 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 623026/02     Offered on: March 26, 2009   at: 1:04 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 653128/02     Offered on: March 26, 2009   at: 1:13 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 463025/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 12:46 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 833124/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 1:01 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 24, 2009: Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-20)
March 26, 2009: Motion Recommit to Committee (Pipkin) Rejected (17-30)
March 26, 2009: Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) {344430/3 Adopted (30-15)
March 26, 2009: Floor Amendment (Stoltzfus) {623026/2 Rejected (22-24)
March 26, 2009: Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {213729/1 Rejected (20-27)
March 26, 2009: Floor Amendment (Glassman) {653128/2 Adopted (28-19)
March 28, 2009: Third Reading Passed (24-23)
March 28, 2009: Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Exum) Rejected (22-25)
House
April 6, 2009: Floor Amendment (Jennings) {463025/1 Rejected (43-87)
April 6, 2009: Floor Amendment (Stifler) {833124/1 Rejected (44-88)
April 6, 2009: Third Reading Passed (90-46)