2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 1049

File Code: Family Law Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 845
Sponsored By:
Senator Muse
Entitled:
Education - Tween/Teen Dating Violence

Synopsis:

Requiring the State Board of Education to encourage county boards of education to incorporate specified lessons on dating violence into the county boards' health education curriculum.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
3/9
First Reading Senate Rules
3/13
Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
3/16
Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/18
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
4/10
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
4/3
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10
Re-referred Ways and Means & Judiciary
Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/9
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 344

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Holidays and Special Dates
Public Schools
Students
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment

Bill affects the following Statute:

Education
( 7-411.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 464537/01     Offered on: April 7, 2009   at: 9:58 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 295168/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 12:44 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
April 4, 2009: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
House
April 9, 2009: Third Reading Passed (131-0)