2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 44

File Code: Taxes - Sales and Use Prior Year Introduction As: HB 1521/08 - W&M Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 95
Sponsored By:
Senators Peters, Harris, Astle, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Della, Dyson, Edwards, Exum, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Glassman, Greenip, Haines, Harrington, Jacobs, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Mooney, Munson, Muse, Pinsky, Pipkin, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Stoltzfus, Stone, and Zirkin
Entitled:
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans' Organizations

Synopsis:

Extending from June 30, 2009, to June 30, 2012, the termination date for a sales and use tax exemption for sales to specified veterans' organizations.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
11/10
Pre-filed
1/14
First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/21
Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2/26
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Adopted
Special Order 2/27 (Senator Stone) Adopted
2/27
Floor Amendment (Senator Peters) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/3
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/10
Returned Passed
House Action
3/4
First Reading Ways and Means
3/25
Hearing 4/9 at 1:00 p.m.
4/13
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/10
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/11
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 506

Sponsored by:

Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator David R. Brinkley, District 4
Senator James Brochin, District 42
Senator Richard F. Colburn, District 37
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr., District 32
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Roy P. Dyson, District 29
Senator George C. Edwards, District 1
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Janet Greenip, District 33
Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Andrew P. Harris, District 7
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer, District 12
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Allan H. Kittleman, District 9
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator Donald F. Munson, District 2
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator E. J. Pipkin, District 36
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator J. Lowell Stoltzfus, District 38
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6
Senator Bobby A. Zirkin, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Exemptions
Nonprofit Organizations
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Veterans

Bill affects the following Statute:

Tax - General
( 11-204 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 463827/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:36 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 623921/01     Offered on: February 27, 2009   at: 11:56 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 3, 2009: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 11, 2009: Third Reading Passed (136-0)