2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 183

File Code: Higher Education Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 85
Sponsored By:
Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, Brochin, Conway, Dyson, Forehand, Frosh, Harrington, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, Peters, Raskin, and Klausmeier
Entitled:
College Textbook Competition and Affordability Act of 2009

Synopsis:

Requiring public institutions of higher education in the State, with one exception, to develop and implement informational campaigns, procedures, and practices relating to college textbooks and supplemental material regarding content revisions, availability, and cost; requiring publishers of college textbooks to disclose information relating to prices, revisions in content and format, and a list of integrated textbooks to faculty, textbook adopting entities, or institution administrations; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/22
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
1/26
Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/20
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2/23
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 2/25 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2/25
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) Rejected
Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Rejected (22-24)
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Rejected (22-24)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/27
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
4/6
Special Order later today (Senator Garagiola) Adopted
Motion Senate Concur - House Amendments (Senator Conway)
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/2
First Reading Appropriations
3/18
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-2)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 520

Sponsored by:

Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator James Brochin, District 42
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Roy P. Dyson, District 29
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Advertising
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Community Colleges
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer
Electronic Government
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Leases and Rent
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Information
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Textbooks

Bill affects the following Statute:

Education
( 15-112 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 123428/01     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: Noon     Status: Adopted
Number: 253721/02     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 12:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 254365/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 1:34 p.m.     Status: Special Ordered
Number: 463128/01     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 12:17 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 664235/01     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 11:43 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 703127/01     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 12:24 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 843121/01     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 12:12 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 843323/03     Offered on: February 25, 2009   at: 12:01 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 254365/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 10:39 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
February 25, 2009: Floor Amendment (Middleton) {463128/1 Rejected (22-24)
February 25, 2009: Floor Amendment (Middleton) {703127/1 Rejected (22-24)
February 27, 2009: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
April 6, 2009: Third Reading Passed (44-3)
House
April 4, 2009: Third Reading Passed (131-2)