2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 247

File Code: Health Occupations Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 173
Sponsored By:
Senators Rosapepe, Colburn, Greenip, Harrington, Harris, and Kelley
Entitled:
Health Occupations - Maryland Athletic Trainers Act

Synopsis:

Establishing the Athletic Trainer Advisory Committee as a subunit of the State Board of Physicians; establishing specified fees for services provided by the Board to athletic trainers; providing for the composition, appointment, and terms of the Committee members; establishing the powers and duties of the Committee; requiring specified individuals to be licensed by the Board as athletic trainers before performing specified work; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/23
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/4
Hearing 2/18 at 1:15 p.m.
3/27
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Exum) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/29
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
4/9
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/28
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6
Re-referred Health and Government Operations
4/7
Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 529

Sponsored by:

Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Richard F. Colburn, District 37
Senator Janet Greenip, District 33
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Andrew P. Harris, District 7
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hearings
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Notices
Penalties
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Sunset

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health Occupations
( 14-5D-01 , 14-5D-02 , 14-5D-03 , 14-5D-04 , 14-5D-05 , 14-5D-06 , 14-5D-07 , 14-5D-08 , 14-5D-09 , 14-5D-10 , 14-5D-11 , 14-5D-12 , 14-5D-13 , 14-5D-14 , 14-5D-15 , 14-5D-16 , 14-5D-17 , 14-5D-18 , 14-5D-19 , 14-5D-20 )
State Government
( 8-403 , 8-403 , 8-403 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 164431/01     Offered on: March 30, 2009   at: 3:26 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 883320/01     Offered on: March 30, 2009   at: 3:27 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 946287/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 10:57 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 29, 2009: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
April 9, 2009: Third Reading Passed (40-0)
House
April 5, 2009: Third Reading Passed (132-0)