2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 264

File Code: State Government - Personnel Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 298
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Kelley, Exum, Klausmeier, Conway, Gladden, Jones, King, Madaleno, Pinsky, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Lenett
Entitled:
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Negotiations - "The Fair Share Act"

Synopsis:

Authorizing collective bargaining negotiations pertaining to specified State employees to include negotiations relating to the right of an employee organization to receive service fees from nonmembers; exempting employees whose religious beliefs are opposed to joining or financially supporting a specified labor organization from the requirement under specified circumstances; providing that an employee who is exempt from paying a service fee shall make an alternative payment to a specified tax-exempt organization and furnish proof; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/23
First Reading Finance
2/4
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/27
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 3/31 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
4/10
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/29
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/6
Re-referred Appropriations
4/13
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) Rejected (36-100)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Haddaway) Rejected (37-99)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (38-98)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (35-99)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/9
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) Rejected (34-94)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (37-97)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Elmore) Rejected (37-94)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) Rejected (36-95)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Schuler) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-35)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 187

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Collective Bargaining
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Gifts
Nonprofit Organizations
Religion -see also- Churches
State Employees
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statute:

State Personnel and Pensions
( 3-502 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 817475/02     Offered on: March 31, 2009   at: 12:17 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 173326/01     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 6:23 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 273926/02     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 6:06 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 333423/01     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 6:01 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 344565/01     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 11:32 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 453825/02     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 12:26 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 523627/03     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 12:40 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 683820/02     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 12:36 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 723028/01     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 6:28 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 853426/02     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 12:17 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 30, 2009: Third Reading Passed (32-15)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (32-15)
House
April 8, 2009: Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {853426/2 Rejected (36-100)
April 8, 2009: Floor Amendment (Haddaway) {453825/2 Rejected (37-99)
April 8, 2009: Floor Amendment (Krebs) {683820/2 Rejected (38-98)
April 8, 2009: Floor Amendment (Shank) {523627/3 Rejected (35-99)
April 9, 2009: Floor Amendment (Smigiel) {333423/1 Rejected (34-94)
April 9, 2009: Floor Amendment (Shank) Rejected (37-97)
April 9, 2009: Floor Amendment (Elmore) {173326/1 Rejected (37-94)
April 9, 2009: Floor Amendment (McConkey) {723028/1 Rejected (36-95)
April 9, 2009: Third Reading Passed (97-35)