2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 278

File Code: Environment Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 315
Sponsored By:
Senator Pinsky and the President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Conway, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Kelley, King, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Jones
Entitled:
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act of 2009

Synopsis:

Requiring the Department of the Environment to publish and update an inventory of statewide greenhouse gas emissions for calendar year 2006; requiring the State to reduce statewide greenhouse gas emissions by 25% from 2006 levels by 2020; requiring the State to develop and adopt a specified plan, adopt specified regulations, and implement specified programs to reduce greenhouse gas emissions; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/23
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
1/28
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs)
2/20
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/23
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2/24
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 2/26 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2/26
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Exum) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Jones) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Mooney) Rejected (1-44)
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Rejected (17-29)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/2
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
4/10
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/3
First Reading Economic Matters & Environmental Matters
3/25
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/8
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (107-30)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 172

Sponsored by:

Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Administration
Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
President, The
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agriculture, Department of
Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Annotated Code of Maryland
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Energy Matters -see also- Fuel; Power Plants; Solar Energy
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee.
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Industry and Technology
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Environment
( 2-1201 , 2-1202 , 2-1203 , 2-1204 , 2-1205 , 2-1206 , 2-1207 , 2-1208 , 2-1209 , 2-1210 , 2-1211 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 103029/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:55 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 144630/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:49 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 213527/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:52 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 503927/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:52 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 623423/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:50 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 943121/01     Offered on: February 26, 2009   at: 10:50 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 483594/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 12:22 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
February 26, 2009: Floor Amendment (Mooney) {503927/1 Rejected (1-44)
February 26, 2009: Floor Amendment (Jacobs) {103029/1 Rejected (17-29)
March 2, 2009: Third Reading Passed (36-9)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (36-9)
House
April 8, 2009: Third Reading Passed (107-30)