2009 Regular Session

Ballots

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 20

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 391

    Status as of April 7, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, Gutierrez, Ivey, Rice, Ross, F. Turner, Frick, Gilchrist, Shank, Murphy, Cardin, Howard, Hixson, Bartlett, Kaiser, Myers, Walker, Olszewski, Stukes, and George
    Entitled
    Voter's Rights Protection Act of 2009
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Sponsored By
    Caroline County Delegation
    Entitled
    Caroline County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members - Referendum
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 512

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kipke, Beidle, Costa, Dwyer, George, King, Love, McConkey, Schuh, and Sophocleus
    Entitled
    Anne Arundel County - Election Law - Photo Identification for Voting
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 523

    Status as of February 5, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Ross
    Entitled
    Elections - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 665

    Status as of February 16, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hixson, Bobo, Boteler, Cardin, Frick, George, Ivey, Myers, Olszewski, and F. Turner
    Entitled
    Election Law - Audit of Election Results - Transparency in Election Administration
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1066

    Status as of February 16, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Jennings, Aumann, Bartlett, Boteler, Dwyer, Frank, Haddaway, Impallaria, Kelly, McConkey, McDonough, Norman, Smigiel, and Stifler
    Entitled
    Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1179

    Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 445

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Cardin, Hixson, Olszewski, and Ross
    Entitled
    Election Law - Early Voting
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1391

    Status as of March 4, 2009: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Elections, State Board of)
    Entitled
    Election Law - Candidates - Challenges to Qualifications
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1392

    Status as of April 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Elections, State Board of)
    Entitled
    Election Law - Miscellaneous Revisions
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1394

    Status as of April 9, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Elections, State Board of)
    Entitled
    Election Law - Employment and Compensation of Election Judges
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 43

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senators Harris, Greenip, Colburn, and Kittleman
    Entitled
    Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 197

    Status as of February 13, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Lenett
    Entitled
    Election Law - Early Voting and Polling Places
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 320

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Gladden
    Entitled
    Voter's Rights Protection Act of 2009
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 327

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Colburn
    Entitled
    Election Law - Runoff Election
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 445

    Status as of February 13, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Madaleno
    Entitled
    Petitions - Signer Photo Identification Requirement and Affidavit
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 557

    Status as of February 13, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senators Dyson, Lenett, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Exum, Forehand, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Stone, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Election Law - Implementation of Early Voting and Polling Places
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 595

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Kasemeyer
    Entitled
    Election Law - Audit of Election Results - Transparency in Election Administration
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 693

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senators Rosapepe, Frosh, Garagiola, Harrington, Jones, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Stone, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Election Law - Maryland Student Voting Rights Act of 2009
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 733

    Status as of February 11, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senators Raskin, Lenett, Peters, and Pugh
    Entitled
    Elections - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 1033

    Status as of April 11, 2009: Bill is in the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Senators Madaleno, Raskin, and Lenett
    Entitled
    Special Election - Absentee Voting - Late Applications
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Ways and Means