2009 Regular Session

Nuclear Matters -see also- Power Plants

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 7

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 720

    Status as of March 20, 2009: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McDonough and Shewell
    Entitled
    Nuclear Generating Facility - Sale of Electricity at Lowest Best Price and Disclosure of Rates
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1054

    Status as of February 13, 2009: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Niemann
    Entitled
    Environment - Permitting Process - Environmental Justice Review
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1078

    Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 193

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Niemann
    Entitled
    Environment - Permit Applications - Notice Requirements
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1569

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 651

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McIntosh, Barkley, Beidle, Carr, V. Clagett, Dumais, Frush, Glenn, Haynes, Healey, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lee, McHale, Morhaim, Niemann, Olszewski, Riley, Robinson, Stein, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Standing - Miscellaneous Environmental Protection Proceedings and Judicial Review
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 4

    Status as of January 14, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Harrington
    Entitled
    Environment - Permitting Process - Environmental Justice Review
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 47

    Status as of May 7, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 192

    Sponsored By
    Senator Harrington
    Entitled
    Environment - Permit Applications - Notice Requirements
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 1065

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 650

    Sponsored By
    Senators Frosh, Harrington, and Lenett
    Entitled
    Standing - Miscellaneous Environmental Protection Proceedings and Judicial Review
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters