2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 685

File Code: Environment
Sponsored By:
Delegates Stein, Cardin, Carr, Hucker, and Morhaim
Entitled:
Environment - Fluorescent and Compact Fluorescent Light Recycling - County Plans

Synopsis:

Requiring a county recycling plan to address the collection and recycling of fluorescent and compact fluorescent lights that contain mercury; requiring a county to submit a revised recycling plan by October 1, 2011, to address this new requirement; and authorizing a county to utilize specified programs in a specified strategy.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/4
First Reading Environmental Matters
2/10
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
3/16
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
3/18
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
4/3
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/19
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/22
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 430

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dana Stein, District 11
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Recycling
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Bill affects the following Statute:

Environment
( 9-1703 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 114736/01     Offered on: April 8, 2010   at: 12:46 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 18, 2010: Third Reading Passed (136-2)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Senate
April 5, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)