2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 556

File Code: Environment
Sponsored By:
Senators Conway, Della, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kelley, Kramer, Madaleno, Miller, Muse, Pugh, and Raskin
Entitled:
Environment - Decabrominated Diphenyl Ether - Prohibitions

Synopsis:

Prohibiting, on or after specified dates, the manufacturing, leasing, selling, or distributing of specified products that contain decabrominated diphenyl ether; providing that the Act does not prohibit retailers from selling, recycling, or disposing of specified products that contain decabrominated diphenyl ether under specified circumstances; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified persons from recycling specified products that contain decabrominated diphenyl ether; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/4
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/17
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted
Special Order 3/24 (Senator Conway) Adopted
3/25
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/26
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
4/9
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/23
First Reading Environmental Matters
3/30
Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
4/12
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (139-1)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 320

Sponsored by:

Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Recycling

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Environment
( 6-1201 , 6-1202.1 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 794933/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 11:29 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 843125/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 11:31 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 880910/01     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 5:35 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
House
Environmental Matters
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 26, 2010: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
April 9, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 7, 2010: Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (McIntosh) Adopted (139-1)
April 7, 2010: Third Reading Passed (141-0)