2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 402

File Code: Business Regulation and Occupations
Sponsored By:
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Entitled:
Collection Agencies - Application and Renewal Fees

Synopsis:

Requiring the State Collection Agency Licensing Board to set by regulation collection agency license application fees, renewal fees, and investigation fees, subject to specified limitations; requiring the fees to be reasonable and set in a specified manner; requiring the Board to publish a fee schedule; providing that the fees in effect on October 1, 2010, remain in effect until the fees set by regulation take effect; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Economic Matters
2/3
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/9
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/4
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
4/2
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/5
First Reading Finance
3/23
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 4/7 (Senator Harris) Adopted
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/13
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 149

Sponsored by:

Economic Matters Committee, Chair
Departmental
Labor, Licensing and Regulation, Department of

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments
Fees -see also- Attys` Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates.
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest.
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Business Regulation
( 7-302 , 7-302.1 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 553793/01     Offered on: March 2, 2010   at: 10:11 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 567078/01     Offered on: April 7, 2010   at: 10:56 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Economic Matters
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
April 2, 2010: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
April 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (43-4)