2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 279

File Code: Insurance - Health Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 525
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Frosh, Lenett, Currie, Della, Gladden, Harrington, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Middleton, Pinsky, Raskin, Robey, and Rosapepe
Entitled:
Maryland False Health Claims Act of 2010

Synopsis:

Prohibiting actions constituting false claims against a State health plan or a State health program; providing penalties for making false claims against a State health plan or a State health program; requiring the court to consider and give special attention to specified factors in determining the fines and penalties provided for in the Act; authorizing the State or a person on behalf of the State to file a civil action against a person who makes a false claim against a State health plan or a State health program; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/22
First Reading Judicial Proceedings & Finance
1/27
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2/2
Hearing cancelled (Judicial Proceedings)
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Special Order 3/18 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
3/18
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman)
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
3/19
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (20-26)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/23
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
4/6
Returned Passed
House Action
3/21
First Reading Judiciary & Appropriations
3/23
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
4/8
Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/1
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant)
Special Order next session (Delegate Schuler) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant) Rejected (61-73)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (35-97)
Second Reading Passed
4/2
Floor Amendment (Delegate Reznik) Rejected (59-78)
Third Reading Passed (105-33)
Action after passage in Senate and House
4/13
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 4

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator David C. Harrington, District 47
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Attorneys` Fees
Attorney General
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Comptroller
Court Costs
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans`; etc.
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest.
Jurisdiction
Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs
Medical Assistance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Statutes of Limitation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 2-601 , 2-602 , 2-603 , 2-604 , 2-605 , 2-606 , 2-607 , 2-608 , 2-609 , 2-610 , 2-611 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 138975/01     Offered on: March 17, 2010   at: 12:22 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 763228/01     Offered on: March 19, 2010   at: 12:07 p.m.     Status: Rejected
House
Number: 293920/01     Offered on: April 9, 2010   at: 1:32 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 323628/01     Offered on: April 8, 2010   at: 1:17 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 953121/01     Offered on: April 8, 2010   at: 12:14 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
House
Appropriations
Judiciary
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 19, 2010: Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {763228/1 Rejected (20-26)
March 23, 2010: Third Reading Passed (37-8)
House
April 1, 2010: Floor Amendment (Tarrant) Rejected (61-73)
April 1, 2010: Floor Amendment (Shank) {323628/1 Rejected (35-98)
April 2, 2010: Floor Amendment (Reznik) {293920/1 Rejected (59-78)
April 2, 2010: Third Reading Passed (105-33)