2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 593

File Code: Health Care Facilities and Regulation Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 699
Sponsored By:
Senators Garagiola, King, Pipkin, Colburn, Della, Exum, Forehand, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, and Pugh
Entitled:
Health Facilities - Freestanding Medical Facilities - Rates

Synopsis:

Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to pay specified rates for specified hospital services; specifying that emergency services include services provided at specified facilities for the purposes of hospital rate setting; requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to set rates for hospital services provided at specified freestanding medical facilities; altering the circumstances under which the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene must issue a license to a freestanding medical facility; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/5
First Reading Finance
2/16
Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/25
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Currie) Adopted
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/27
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/7
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/26
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/31
Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/20
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 505

Sponsored by:

Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Richard F. Colburn, District 37
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Nancy J. King, District 39
Senator Allan H. Kittleman, District 9
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator E. J. Pipkin, District 36
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Clinics
Emergency Medical Services
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs
Medical Assistance
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 15-105 , 19-114 , 19-131 , 19-201 , 19-201 , 19-211 , 19-3A-03 , 19-3A-07 , 19-3A-08 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 497670/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 11:16 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 533822/02     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 12:37 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 326881/01     Offered on: April 9, 2010   at: 11:39 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Finance
House
Health and Government Operations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 27, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 7, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (136-0)