2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 439

EMERGENCY BILL File Code: Primary and Secondary Education Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 452
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kaiser, Cardin, Ivey, Olszewski, Rice, Stukes, and Walker
Entitled:
Education - Innovative School Scheduling Models - Low-Performing and At-Risk Public Schools

Synopsis:

Requiring the State Board of Education to explore the use of innovative school scheduling models, including extended year and year-round schooling, in low-performing and at-risk public schools; requiring the State Board to encourage county boards to use the school scheduling models that are determined to be the most effective in enhancing student achievement in low-performing or at-risk public schools; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Ways and Means
2/10
Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
3/27
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
4/2
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Kaiser, Rice, and Gilchrist
4/6
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/27
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
4/6
Senate Recede
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 299

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate John A. Olszewski, Jr., District 6
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate Melvin L. Stukes, District 44
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Federal Government
Grants
Public Schools
State Aid

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 7-103 , 7-103.1 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 915169/01     Offered on: March 27, 2010   at: 12:42 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 664034/01     Offered on: April 7, 2010   at: 12:09 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 25, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 6, 2010: Third Reading Passed (47-0)