2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 882

File Code: Insurance - Health Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 774
Sponsored By:
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Barnes, Conaway, Frick, Heller, Ivey, Manno, McConkey, Ramirez, Reznik, Simmons, Benson, Bromwell, Costa, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Jenkins, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, Kullen, McDonough, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Riley, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Entitled:
Insurance Producers - Use of Senior or Retiree Credential or Designation

Synopsis:

Prohibiting an insurance producer from using a senior or retiree credential or designation in a way that is or would be misleading in connection with the offer, sale, or purchase of life insurance, health insurance, or annuities; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, in consultation with the Securities Commissioner of the Division of Securities in the Office of the Attorney General, to adopt regulations; providing for specified exemptions; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/10
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/24
Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/19
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
4/3
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/22
First Reading Finance
3/23
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/20
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 605

Sponsored by:

Delegate Benjamin F. Kramer, District 19
Delegate Charles Barkley, District 39
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Frank M. Conaway, Jr., District 40
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate C. William Frick, District 16
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate Henry B. Heller, District 19
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Charles A. Jenkins, District 3B
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Susan W. Krebs, District 9B
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19
Delegate Tony McConkey, District 33A
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Victor R. Ramirez, District 47
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Luiz R. S. Simmons, District 17
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Elderly Persons
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Insurance Administration
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Investments -see also- Securities
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Rules and Regulations
Securities

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Insurance
( 27-201 , 27-223 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 876980/01     Offered on: March 17, 2010   at: 10:55 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 947471/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:26 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 19, 2010: Third Reading Passed (127-0)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 1, 2010: Third Reading Passed (46-0)