2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1263

EMERGENCY BILL File Code: Higher Education Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 899
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Busch, Hixson, Kaiser, and Rosenberg
Entitled:
Education Reform Act of 2010

Synopsis:

Altering the probationary period of employment of a certificated employee in a local school system; altering specified procedures related to the probationary period of a certificated employee; requiring a county board of education to evaluate annually a nontenured certificated employee based on established performance evaluation criteria; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/18
First Reading Ways and Means
2/22
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
4/2
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Delegates Kaiser, Olszewski, and Rice
4/8
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
4/9
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Special Order later today (Senator Mooney) Adopted
Special Order 4/6 (Senator Mooney) Adopted
4/2
Special Order later today (Senator Mooney) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Mooney) Rejected (13-34)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)
4/6
Senate Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Senators Pinsky, Conway, and Rosapepe
4/9
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 189

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Michael E. Busch, District 30
Delegate Sheila E. Hixson, District 20
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Federal Government
Grants
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Mentors
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Students
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 6-202 , 6-306 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 485762/01     Offered on: March 23, 2010   at: 11:16 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 723729/01     Offered on: April 6, 2010   at: 1:36 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 924137/01     Offered on: April 2, 2010   at: 12:35 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents::
Report Number: 383021/1     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:48 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 753224/1     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:48 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2010: Third Reading Passed (136-3)
April 8, 2010: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Senate
April 2, 2010: Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (13-34)
April 2, 2010: Floor Amendment (Mooney) {723729/1 Rejected (13-34)
April 2, 2010: Third Reading Passed (42-5)
April 2, 2010: Third Reading Passed (42-5)
April 9, 2010: Third Reading Passed (44-3)