2010 Regular Session

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 16

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 795

    Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 163

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Lee, Barkley, G. Clagett, Doory, Dumais, Frick, Gutierrez, Heller, Kaiser, Mathias, McDonough, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Rice, Robinson, Tarrant, and Taylor
    Entitled
    Task Force to Study Nanobiotechnology
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Sponsored By
    Delegate Heller (Chair, Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds) and Delegates Elmore, Howard, and Levy
    Entitled
    Political Subdivisions - Financial Reports
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 908

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 713

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Feldman, Hecht, Rice, Stein, and Bronrott
    Entitled
    Maryland Clean Energy Center - Miscellaneous Provisions
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters and Appropriations
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 943

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 276

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McIntosh, Beidle, Bobo, Bronrott, Cane, Carr, DeBoy, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Healey, Hecht, Howard, Hucker, Kaiser, Kullen, Lafferty, McHale, Montgomery, Morhaim, Niemann, Olszewski, Ramirez, Reznik, Riley, and Weir
    Entitled
    Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1014

    Status as of February 24, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hecht, Waldstreicher, Barkley, Bobo, Bronrott, G. Clagett, Feldman, Frick, Gilchrist, Guzzone, Lafferty, Lee, Manno, McHale, Mizeur, Montgomery, Niemann, Rice, and Stull
    Entitled
    Clean Energy Loan Programs
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1159

    Status as of April 12, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Costa, Bates, Dwyer, Elmore, Frank, George, Kipke, McComas, Norman, Schuh, and Sossi
    Entitled
    Budget Reduction Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1182

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 461

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ivey, Benson, Frush, McIntosh, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Ramirez, and Valderrama
    Entitled
    Business Improvement Districts
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1464

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 739

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Myers, Beitzel, Kelly, Lafferty, Norman, Serafini, Stein, and Stull
    Entitled
    Land Bank Authorities - Establishment by Municipal Corporations
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 59

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 210

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
    Entitled
    Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Distribution and Use of Revenue
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 63

    Status as of January 13, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
    Entitled
    Transit-Oriented Development - Pledge and Use of Tax Increment Revenues - Operations and Maintenance Funding
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 311

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 275

    Sponsored By
    Senators Miller, Klausmeier, Astle, Brochin, DeGrange, Della, Dyson, Exum, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, and Robey
    Entitled
    Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 347

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 547

    Sponsored By
    Senator Jones (Chair, Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds) and Senators Currie, Forehand, and Haines
    Entitled
    Political Subdivisions - Financial Reports
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 628

    Status as of March 31, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stoltzfus
    Entitled
    Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Requirements
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 720

    Status as of February 24, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Middleton
    Entitled
    Clean Energy Loan Programs
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 840

    Status as of February 26, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Reilly
    Entitled
    Budget Reduction Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Sponsored By
    Senator Garagiola
    Entitled
    Maryland Clean Energy Center - Miscellaneous Provisions
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters and Appropriations