2010 Regular Session

Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 18

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 647

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 428

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Reznik, Hammen, Donoghue, Pena-Melnyk, Riley, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Department of Natural Resources - Conservation Service Opportunities - Procurement Exemption
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 733

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 433

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Beitzel
    Entitled
    Garrett County - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Emergency Services Board
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 735

    Status as of March 9, 2010: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Rosenberg
    Entitled
    Workers' Compensation - Exemption from Covered Employment - AmeriCorps Program Workers
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 754

    Status as of February 10, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Stocksdale, Aumann, Bates, Bohanan, DeBoy, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Haddaway, Impallaria, Jennings, Krebs, Love, Mathias, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, O'Donnell, Shewell, Smigiel, Sossi, Stull, and Wood
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 943

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 276

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McIntosh, Beidle, Bobo, Bronrott, Cane, Carr, DeBoy, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Healey, Hecht, Howard, Hucker, Kaiser, Kullen, Lafferty, McHale, Montgomery, Morhaim, Niemann, Olszewski, Ramirez, Reznik, Riley, and Weir
    Entitled
    Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Sponsored By
    Carroll County Delegation
    Entitled
    Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1108

    Status as of April 9, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Carroll County Delegation
    Entitled
    Carroll County - Gaming
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1389

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 735

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Vallario, Conway, Anderson, Aumann, Bohanan, Branch, Bronrott, Cane, DeBoy, Doory, Eckardt, Elmore, Gaines, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway, Haynes, Heller, James, Jones, Levy, Mathias, Mizeur, Proctor, Robinson, Rosenberg, Wood, Benson, Bromwell, Costa, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Jenkins, Kach, Kullen, McDonough, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Riley, Tarrant, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Traffic Cases - State Police Helicopters and Ambulance, Fire, and Rescue Companies
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HJ 8

    Status as of April 12, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable House Rules and Executive Nominations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kelly, Beitzel, Kramer, Myers, Simmons, and Smigiel
    Entitled
    Secondary Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Instruction
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 141

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 484

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration)
    Entitled
    Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 197

    Status as of February 10, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Glassman and Jacobs
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Community Emergency Response Team (CERT)
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 311

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 275

    Sponsored By
    Senators Miller, Klausmeier, Astle, Brochin, DeGrange, Della, Dyson, Exum, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, and Robey
    Entitled
    Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Sponsored By
    Senator Edwards
    Entitled
    Garrett County - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Emergency Services Board
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 864

    Status as of March 2, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator McFadden
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 924

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 636

    Sponsored By
    Carroll County Senators
    Entitled
    Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 938

    Status as of February 25, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Carroll County Senators
    Entitled
    Carroll County - Gaming
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 1018

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 372

    Sponsored By
    Senator DeGrange
    Entitled
    Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 1055

    Status as of March 1, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules

    Sponsored By
    Senator Muse
    Entitled
    Health Occupations - Restricted Volunteer Dentist's License - Restricted Volunteer Dental Hygienist's License
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Senate Rules