2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 347

File Code: Environment Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 372
Sponsored By:
Delegate Lafferty
Entitled:
Environment - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Evaluation and Ranking

Synopsis:

Requiring the Department of the Environment to evaluate and rank all best available nitrogen removal technologies for on-site sewage disposal systems to advise local governments and citizens of the State of approved technologies that qualify for funding under the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department to make available a specified evaluation and ranking on the Department's Web site; requiring the Department to provide evaluation and ranking information to a county, municipality, or State resident; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/2
First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7

Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/8
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/10
Third Reading Passed (131-5)
4/7
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/11
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 455

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Grants
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Information
Sewage

Bill affects the following Statute:

Environment
( 9-1108.1 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 210218/01     Offered on: March 8, 2011   at: 10:25 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 514638/01     Offered on: April 8, 2011   at: 2:34 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 10, 2011: Third Reading Passed (131-5)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Senate
April 5, 2011: Third Reading Passed (45-0)