2011 Regular Session

Noise

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 6

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1215

    Status as of March 17, 2011: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Schuh, Barnes, Beidle, Costa, Dwyer, Frush, Kipke, McConkey, McMillan, Pena-Melnyk, Sophocleus, and Vitale
    Entitled
    Environment - Exemption from Noise Restrictions - Marinas and Boatyards
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1223

    Status as of April 5, 2011: Bill is in the House - House Conference Committee Appointed

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Malone
    Entitled
    Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Task Force - Reconstitution
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 12

    Status as of March 31, 2011: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stone
    Entitled
    Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Advisory Committee
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 153

    Status as of February 21, 2011: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Colburn
    Entitled
    Reorganization of State Government - Consolidating the Department of the Environment into the Department of Natural Resources
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 620

    Status as of May 10, 2011: Became Law - Chapter 264

    Sponsored By
    Senators Manno, Forehand, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Ramirez
    Entitled
    Real Property - Retaliatory Actions - Landlords and Mobile Home Park Owners
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 863

    Status as of March 21, 2011: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Simonaire
    Entitled
    Environment - Exemption from Noise Restrictions - Marinas and Boatyards
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs