2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 84

File Code: State Pensions and Retirement Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 250
Sponsored By:
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Entitled:
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees - Exemptions

Synopsis:

Providing that specified retirees of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System are subject to a specified offset of a retirement allowance under specified circumstances; reducing from 9 to 5 years the number of years required after retirement for specified retirees of the State Police Retirement System or Correctional Officers System to be exempt from an earnings offset of their retirement allowance when reemployed by specified employers; providing for the effective dates of specified provisions of the Act; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
1/18
First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2/27

Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2/28
Favorable with Amendments {574969/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/1
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
4/5
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/2
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 3/8 at 8:30 a.m.
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29
Favorable with Amendments {159831/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 470

Sponsored by:

Delegate Melony G. Griffith, District 25
Pensions, Joint Committee on

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

State Personnel and Pensions
( 24-405 , 24-405 , 25-403 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 574969/01     Offered on: February 28, 2012   at: 10:16 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 159831/01     Offered on: April 4, 2012   at: 5:43 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Appropriations
Senate
Budget and Taxation
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 1, 2012: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
April 5, 2012: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Senate
April 1, 2012: Third Reading Passed (45-0)