2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 277

File Code: State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 343
Sponsored By:
Delegates Walker, Vaughn, Pendergrass, Costa, Cullison, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, and Tarrant
Entitled:
State Government - Brokerage and Investment Management Services - Use of Minority Business Enterprises - Application

Synopsis:

Making additional State units that are responsible for the management of specified funds subject to requirements under current law concerning the use of minority business enterprise brokerage and investment services firms, as specified; specifying that an annual report that must be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by all of the units that are subject to the minority business enterprise brokerage and investment services firm requirements include diversity information, as specified; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
1/27
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/1
Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/23
Favorable with Amendments {776989/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/28
Special Order until 2/29 (Delegate Schulz) Adopted
2/29
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
4/2
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (128-3)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/1
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Budget and Taxation
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/29
Favorable with Amendments {204036/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 489

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jay Walker, District 26
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Ariana B. Kelly, District 16
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Peter Murphy, District 28
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agents and Brokers
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Electronic Government
Higher Education Commission
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Investments -see also- Securities
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Minorities -see also- Women
Notices
Reports
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
State Employees
Teachers
Treasurers
Workers' Compensation

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Article - 95 Treasurer
( 22G , 22G )
Economic Development
( 14-102 , 14-103 )
Education
( 11-1001 )
Housing and Community Development
( 4-501.1 )
Insurance
( 20-303 )
Labor and Employment
( 10-122 )
State Finance and Procurement
( 6-222 )
State Personnel and Pensions
( 21-116 , 35-302 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Attorney General Letter: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 776989/01     Offered on: February 23, 2012   at: 10:16 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 204036/01     Offered on: April 4, 2012   at: 6:13 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 29, 2012: Third Reading Passed (134-2)
April 2, 2012: Third Reading Passed (128-3)
Senate
March 30, 2012: Third Reading Passed (46-0)