2012 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 283

File Code: Health Occupations Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 274
Sponsored By:
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee and Delegate Elliott
Entitled:
State Board of Pharmacy - Sunset Extension and Revisions

Synopsis:

Continuing the State Board of Pharmacy in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; repealing specified provisions relating to physician-pharmacist agreements to be approved by the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Pharmacy; repealing a provision requiring fees related to therapy management to be established in regulations; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
House Action
1/27
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/23
Favorable with Amendments {146983/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/28
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
4/5
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
2/29
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/31
Favorable with Amendments {424031/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Muse) Adopted
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 658

Sponsored by:

Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates.
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health Occupations
( 12-204 , 12-407 , 12-6A-01 , 12-6A-03 , 12-6A-07 , 12-6A-10 , 12-6C-06 , 12-802 )
State Government
( 8-403 , 8-403 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 146983/01     Offered on: February 23, 2012   at: 10:16 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 424031/01     Offered on: April 6, 2012   at: 11:19 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 28, 2012: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
April 5, 2012: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
April 3, 2012: Third Reading Passed (47-0)