2012 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 880

File Code: State Pensions and Retirement Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 801
Sponsored By:
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Entitled:
State Retirement and Pension System - Transfer of Members Between Systems

Synopsis:

Providing that if an individual who was a member of one of the several systems in the State Retirement and Pension System on June 30, 2011, becomes a member of another one of the several systems on or after July 1, 2011, the individual shall be considered a new member of the subsequent system as of the date the individual joins the system, and is subject to the same requirements to which an individual who was a member of the subsequent system on June 30, 2011, and remains a member on July 1, 2011, is subject; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used. For explanation of terms click here.
Senate Action
2/3
First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/29
Hearing 3/8 at 8:30 a.m.
3/23

Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/20
Favorable with Amendments {529738/1 Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/2
Returned Passed
House Action
3/24
First Reading Appropriations
3/28
Hearing 4/4 at 2:30 p.m.
4/6
Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/1
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/2
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 608

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
State Employees
State Police, Department of
Teachers

Bill affects the following Statutes:

State Personnel and Pensions
( 23-215.2 , 24-208 , 25-207 , 26-207 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 529738/01     Offered on: March 23, 2012   at: 6:41 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Budget and Taxation
House
Appropriations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 22, 2012: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House
April 2, 2012: Third Reading Passed (131-0)