2012 Regular Session

Condemnation

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 8

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 576

    Status as of March 29, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Arora, Bohanan, Clagett, Gaines, Griffith, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, James, Jones, Lafferty, Lee, Love, A. Miller, Niemann, Proctor, Ross, Rudolph, Summers, Washington, Beidle, Glenn, Guzzone, Tarrant, Walker, B. Robinson, Mizeur, and Zucker
    Entitled
    Public-Private Partnerships
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters and Appropriations
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 628

    Status as of March 24, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Carr, Beidle, Braveboy, Cullison, Gutierrez, Hixson, Hucker, Kramer, A. Miller, Mizeur, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Simmons, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 712

    Status as of March 19, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Carr
    Entitled
    Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariff
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1124

    Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 704

    Sponsored By
    St. Mary's County Delegation
    Entitled
    St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Revisions and Corrections
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1155

    Status as of April 9, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frick, Carr, Hixson, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, Mizeur, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Land Acquisition for Department of Transportation
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 358

    Status as of April 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Garagiola, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Pugh, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Public-Private Partnerships
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Environmental Matters and Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 688

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Madaleno
    Entitled
    Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 807

    Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 587

    Sponsored By
    Senators Madaleno, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, Glassman, Jones-Rodwell, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, and McFadden
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Land Acquisition for Department of Transportation
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Ways and Means