2012 Regular Session

Motor Vehicle Equipment

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 21

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 108

    Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Luedtke, Bobo, Frush, Guzzone, Jameson, Kaiser, A. Kelly, McDermott, A. Miller, Reznik, S. Robinson, and Zucker
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 149

    Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 211

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Beidle, Olszewski, Stein, Glenn, Lafferty, Niemann, and Kipke
    Entitled
    Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Titling, Insurance, and Required Use of Protective Headgear
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 270

    Status as of March 5, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Cluster and DeBoy
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Enforcement - Police Officers
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 313

    Status as of April 10, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 47

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Stein, Bobo, Carr, Glenn, Hubbard, and S. Robinson
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Child Safety Seats - Requirements
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 340

    Status as of February 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Arora and Wilson
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 343

    Status as of March 12, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Bobo, Bromwell, Clagett, Clippinger, Hogan, Howard, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Luedtke, B. Robinson, and S. Robinson
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 582

    Status as of April 2, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Barkley
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Vehicles of Public Service Companies - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 608

    Status as of February 7, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Arora, Alston, Clippinger, Cluster, Cullison, Dwyer, George, Hough, McDermott, Parrott, B. Robinson, Valentino-Smith, and Wilson
    Entitled
    Drunk and Drugged Driving - Minor in Vehicle
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 668

    Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 389

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Schulz, Wood, Aumann, Bates, Clagett, Cluster, Eckardt, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Jacobs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, O'Donnell, Otto, Serafini, Smigiel, and Weir
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Trucks, Tractors, and Motor Homes
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 729

    Status as of March 19, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kramer, Anderson, Bromwell, Clippinger, Cluster, Costa, DeBoy, Feldman, Gaines, Glass, Guzzone, Holmes, Ivey, Jameson, Krebs, Lafferty, McComas, McConkey, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Szeliga, and Wood
    Entitled
    Consumer Protection - Tire Age - Required Notice
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 853

    Status as of March 16, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Conaway
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Seatbelts - Exception for Law Enforcement Officers
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 990

    Status as of April 5, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frush, Gaines, Healey, Hubbard, Kaiser, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, and Sophocleus
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception to Prohibition
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 25

    Status as of March 12, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Senator Jacobs (By Request)
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Trucks, Tractors, and Motor Homes
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 185

    Status as of April 10, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 46

    Sponsored By
    Senators Forehand, Conway, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Ramirez, Raskin, and Stone
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Child Safety Seats - Requirements
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 309

    Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 210

    Sponsored By
    Senators Klausmeier, Currie, Forehand, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Madaleno, Montgomery, Robey, Shank, Stone, and Pugh
    Entitled
    Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Titling, Insurance, and Required Use of Protective Headgear
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 340

    Status as of April 2, 2012: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Senator Raskin
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 460

    Status as of March 5, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators King, Forehand, Garagiola, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 478

    Status as of April 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

    Sponsored By
    Senator Ferguson
    Entitled
    Education - School Buses - Fire Safety Standards for Engine Components - Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 563

    Status as of February 8, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Forehand and Montgomery
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 926

    Status as of April 2, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Gladden
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Vehicles of Public Service Companies - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 940

    Status as of March 16, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Dyson
    Entitled
    Consumer Protection - Tire Age - Required Notice
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance