2012 Regular Session

Parking

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 16

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 5

    Status as of February 13, 2012: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Frush
    Entitled
    Prince George's County - Development and Ethics Reform Act of 2012
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 108

    Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Luedtke, Bobo, Frush, Guzzone, Jameson, Kaiser, A. Kelly, McDermott, A. Miller, Reznik, S. Robinson, and Zucker
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 160

    Status as of April 7, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Niemann, Barnes, Beidle, Branch, Braveboy, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Frush, Gilchrist, Glenn, Healey, Hogan, Holmes, Kipke, Lafferty, McMillan, Proctor, Ross, Summers, V. Turner, Weir, and Wilson
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Towing Practices and Procedures
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 386

    Status as of March 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Baltimore County Delegation (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    HB 714

    Status as of April 9, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Gaines, Healey, and Ross
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hamilton Street Parking
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 945

    Status as of March 12, 2012: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frush, Healey, Hubbard, McDonough, B. Robinson, and Sophocleus
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Registration Restrictions
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1018

    Status as of March 21, 2012: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Delegates George, Dumais, Kipke, and McComas
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Parking for Individuals with Disabilities - Van Accessible Spaces
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1051

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hixson and Gilchrist
    Entitled
    Sales and Use Tax - Services
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1313

    Status as of February 28, 2012: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Boteler, Bromwell, Cluster, and Kach
    Entitled
    Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Members - Parking and Golf Privileges
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1467

    Status as of March 20, 2012: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate McIntosh
    Entitled
    Sustainable Communities - Financing and Designation
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters and Ways and Means
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 340

    Status as of April 2, 2012: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Senator Raskin
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Stopping, Standing, and Parking - Plug-In Vehicles
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 347

    Status as of April 4, 2012: Bill is in the House - Second Reading Passed

    Sponsored By
    Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 401

    Status as of May 2, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 228

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pugh, Gladden, and Ramirez
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Towing Practices and Procedures
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    SB 490

    Status as of February 29, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Pinsky
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hamilton Street Parking Garage
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 1016

    Status as of March 30, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

    Sponsored By
    Senators Conway, Ferguson, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, McFadden, and Pugh
    Entitled
    Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Parking Restrictions
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 1101

    Status as of April 6, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Ramirez
    Entitled
    Red Light, Speeding, and Parking Violations - Civil Penalties - Late Payment Fee
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings