About Publications

Publications available on this website are organized into the following categories:

"Legislative and Legal" includes publications that summarize the activity that occurred during each legislative session.

"Budget and Fiscal" includes publications that analyze and summarize the state's budget and other fiscal matters.

"Committee" includes publications that have been presented to committees or reports prepared by committees.

"Commission, Task Force, and Work Group" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by these groups.

"Other" includes all other publications.


Additional publications created by the Department of Legislative Services, mandated by legislation, or requested in the Joint Chair's Budget Report may be found in the Legislative Library & Information Services Catalog.



Publications Look Up




Publication Name ▴Published
2016 - Tax Incentives for Child and Dependent Care ExpensesInterim report of the Joint Committee on Children, Youth and Families1/3/2017
2017 - 21st Century School Facilities Commission - Proposed Meeting Schedule and AgendaProposed meeting schedule, agendas, and links to materials and recordings of meetings.1/13/2017
2017 - 21st Century School Facilities Commission - 2016 Interim ReportProgress report of the work accomplished by the Commission during 2016.2/1/2017
2017 - 21st Century School Facilities Commission - Meeting Materials for January 13, 2017Meeting Materials for January 13, 20171/12/2017
2017 - A Review of Employee Supplemental Retirement SavingsReview of supplemental retirement plans offered by other states and the federal government to assess what strategies are being used to encourage employees to save.1/19/2017
2017 - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education - Proposed Meeting Schedule and AgendaProposed meeting schedule, agendas, and links to materials and recordings of meetings.1/5/2017
2017 - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education - Meeting Materials for January 9, 2017Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education, January 9, 2017 Agenda1/5/2017