About Agendas

The Senate and House Agendas include all scheduled calendars. Additional calendars, messages. or other items may be added to the Agenda during the daily session and may not always appear on the Agenda displayed here.

The Secretary of the Senate prepares a legislative calendar or agenda each day reflecting the matters to be considered during the floor session. The agenda includes committee reports, bills that have been “laid over” or “special ordered” from a prior session, bills on third reading, and other items of interest.

In the House of Delegates, the Office of the Chief Clerk prepares individual calendars for each committee report, bills on third reading, or other items of legislative business to be considered at the floor session.



Related Links


2017 Regular Session Proceedings:


House Agenda

View Senate Agenda
FEBRUARY 28, 2017 - SESSION 1
Appropriations Committee Report No. 4
Distribution Date: February 27, 2017
Second Reading Date: February 28, 2017
FAVORABLE
HB 28
Favorable Delegate Krimm
Unappropriated General Fund Surplus - Appropriation to Pension Fund and Postretirement Health Benefits Trust Fund
HB 103
Favorable Chair, Appropriations Committee
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
HB 199
Favorable Chair, Appropriations Committee
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
HB 324
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Korman
State Personnel - Leap Day Pay Act
HB 817
Favorable Delegate Barnes, B.
Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees
HB 823
Favorable Delegate Barnes, B.
State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
HB 360
Unfavorable Delegate Conaway
Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - Prohibition
HB 450
Unfavorable Delegate Bromwell
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements
HB 670
Unfavorable Delegate Impallaria
Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Top
Environment and Transportation Committee Report No. 3
Distribution Date: February 27, 2017
Second Reading Date: February 28, 2017
FAVORABLE
HB 66
Favorable Delegate Lam
Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited
HB 120
Favorable with Amendments Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
HB 124
Favorable with Amendments Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities
HB 171
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Robinson
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
HB 173
Favorable Delegate Arentz
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
HB 626
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Gilchrist
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
HB 651
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Holmes
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Annual Budgets
HB 851
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Folden
Landlord and Tenant - Military Personnel - Limitation on Liability for Rent
HB 954
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Holmes
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
HB 217
Unfavorable Delegate Krebs
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
HB 264
Unfavorable Dorchester County Delegation
Dorchester County - Authorized Use of Highway User Revenues - Highway Lighting
HB 699
Unfavorable Delegate Lam
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
HB 863
Unfavorable Delegate Barve
State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)
HB 947
Unfavorable Delegate Carr
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
UNFAVORABLE
HB 200
Unfavorable Delegate Lafferty
Real Property - Residential Foreclosures - Filing Fees
HB 500
Unfavorable Delegate Kramer
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
HB 594
Unfavorable Delegate Parrott
Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition Signs
HB 855
Unfavorable Delegate Korman
The Smoke-Free Multifamily Housing Promotion Act
Top
Judiciary Committee Report No. 2
Distribution Date: February 27, 2017
Second Reading Date: February 28, 2017
FAVORABLE
HB 52
Favorable Delegate Conaway
Baltimore City School Police Force - Vehicles and Firearms - Report
HB 293
Favorable Delegate Dumais
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
HB 565
Favorable Carroll County Delegation
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
HB 653
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Wilson, B.
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
HB 755
Favorable Delegate Moon
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
HB 831
Favorable Delegate Dumais
Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
HB 401
Unfavorable Delegate Anderson
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
HB 1361
Unfavorable Delegate Glass
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Hunting Exemptions
UNFAVORABLE
HB 43
Unfavorable Delegate Conaway
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
HB 50
Unfavorable Delegate Conaway
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
HB 58
Unfavorable Delegate Conaway
Baltimore City - Police Tactics and High Crime Zone Notification
HB 276
Unfavorable Delegate Morales
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations
HB 540
Unfavorable Delegate Kramer
Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
HB 608
Unfavorable Delegate Parrott
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
HB 772
Unfavorable Delegate Lisanti
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data
HB 849
Unfavorable Delegate Moon
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
HB 944
Unfavorable Delegate Howard, C.
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - Establishment
Top
MARCH 1, 2017 - SESSION 1
Health and Government Operations Committee Report No. 4
Distribution Date: February 28, 2017
Second Reading Date: March 1, 2017
FAVORABLE
HB 233
Favorable Delegate Barron
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
HB 443
Favorable Delegate West
Assisted Living Programs - Licensure Fees
HB 445
Favorable Delegate West
Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
HB 448
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Bromwell
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Clarifications
HB 524
Favorable Delegate Jacobs
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
HB 664
Favorable with Amendments Delegate Reilly
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
HB 8
Unfavorable Delegate Howard, S.
Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of Delivery
HB 63
Unfavorable Delegate Conaway
Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - Required
HB 191
Unfavorable Delegate Lam
Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration Dates
HB 596
Unfavorable Delegate Sydnor
Procurement - Confidential Proprietary Information, Goods, or Services Provided to a Governmental Entity - Nondisclosure Agreement
HB 727
Unfavorable Delegate Kipke
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
HB 973
Unfavorable Delegate Beitzel
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 25, 2017 5:30 AM