About Agendas

The Senate and House Agendas include all scheduled calendars. Additional calendars, messages. or other items may be added to the Agenda during the daily session and may not always appear on the Agenda displayed here.

The Secretary of the Senate prepares a legislative calendar or agenda each day reflecting the matters to be considered during the floor session. The agenda includes committee reports, bills that have been “laid over” or “special ordered” from a prior session, bills on third reading, and other items of interest.

In the House of Delegates, the Office of the Chief Clerk prepares individual calendars for each committee report, bills on third reading, or other items of legislative business to be considered at the floor session.



Related Links


2018 Regular Session Proceedings:


Senate Agenda

View House Agenda
FEBRUARY 19, 2018 - SESSION 1
Finance Committee Report No. 11
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 19, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 211
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Waugh
Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
SB 444
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
SB 494
Favorable Senator Feldman
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
Top
Distribution Date: February 15, 2018
Third Reading Date: February 16, 2018
Senate Third Reading Calendar No. 20 (General Senate Bills)
SB 160
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Judicial Proceedings
Juvenile Law – Truancy – Applicable Age Range and Affirmative Defense
SB 215
Senator Eckardt
Judicial Proceedings
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
SB 226
Senator Norman
Judicial Proceedings
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by Jury
SB 280
Senator Norman
Judicial Proceedings
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
SB 353
Senator Mathias
Judicial Proceedings
Motor Vehicles - Operation of Golf Carts on State Highways - City of Crisfield
SB 362
Senator Ready
Judicial Proceedings
Vehicle Laws - Registration Fee Exemptions - Disabled Veterans
SB 445
Senator Norman
Judicial Proceedings
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Vehicle With Visual Signals
Top
Distribution Date: February 16, 2018
Third Reading Date: February 19, 2018
Senate Third Reading Calendar No. 21 (General Senate Bills)
SB 42
Senator Norman
Judicial Proceedings
Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Top
FEBRUARY 20, 2018 - SESSION 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 11
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 161
Favorable with Amendments (4) Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Sickle Cell Disease Management Programs
SB 217
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Young
Public Schools - Student Sunscreen Use - Policy
SB 350
Favorable Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
SB 402
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Zucker
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
UNFAVORABLE
SB 301
(Emergency Bill)
Unfavorable President
Protect Our Students Act of 2018
SB 369
Unfavorable Senator Young
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
Top
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 12
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 281
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Simonaire
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
SB 396
Favorable Senator Conway
Open Meetings Act - Training - Application
SB 549
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Zucker
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
SB 680
Favorable Senator King
General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
SB 711
Favorable Senator Eckardt
Health Occupations - Applications for Renewal of Licenses, Permits, Certifications, or Registrations - Available by Mail
Top
Judicial Proceedings Committee Report No. 7
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 107
Favorable Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
SB 170
Favorable Senator Lee
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
SB 297
Favorable with Amendments (1) President
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human Trafficking
SB 436
Favorable with Amendments (2) Caroline County Senators
Caroline County - Sheriff Salary
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 413
Unfavorable Senator Robinson
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Top
Judicial Proceedings Committee Report No. 8
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 28
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Simonaire
Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation for Surviving Spouses of Veterans
SB 267
Favorable Senator Lee
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
SB 292
Favorable with Amendments (3) Senator Norman
Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles
SB 348
Favorable Senator Lee
Estates and Trusts - Contesting Validity of Revocable Trust - Limitation
SB 424
Favorable Senator Zirkin
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
SB 490
Favorable with Amendments (3) Senator Kelley
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information and Investigations
UNFAVORABLE
SB 35
Unfavorable Senator Norman
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction
SB 93
Unfavorable Senator Norman
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Counterclaims and Cross-Claims
Top
Budget and Taxation Committee Report No. 4
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 372
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Kasemeyer
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Tax
SB 373
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Currie
Education - Head Start Program - Annual Appropriation
SB 380
Favorable Senator King
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
SB 381
Favorable Senator King
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
SB 383
Favorable with Amendments (2) Senator Benson
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
SB 420
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Robinson
Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
SB 428
Favorable Senator Bates
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
SB 478
Unfavorable Senator Conway
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Full Circle Auto Repair and Training Center
UNFAVORABLE
SB 457
Unfavorable Senator Salling
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Top
Finance Committee Report No. 12
Distribution Date: February 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: February 20, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 397
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Astle
Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
SB 574
Favorable with Amendments (1) Senator Klausmeier
Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
SB 891
Favorable President
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 19, 2018 10:26 AM