About Agendas

The Senate and House Agendas include all scheduled calendars. Additional calendars, messages. or other items may be added to the Agenda during the daily session and may not always appear on the Agenda displayed here.

The Secretary of the Senate prepares a legislative calendar or agenda each day reflecting the matters to be considered during the floor session. The agenda includes committee reports, bills that have been “laid over” or “special ordered” from a prior session, bills on third reading, and other items of interest.

In the House of Delegates, the Office of the Chief Clerk prepares individual calendars for each committee report, bills on third reading, or other items of legislative business to be considered at the floor session.



Related Links


2017 Regular Session Proceedings:


Senate Agenda

View House Agenda
JANUARY 23, 2018 - SESSION 1
Finance Committee Report No. 4
JANUARY 22, 2018 - SESSION 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee Report No. 3
Distribution Date: January 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: January 22, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 58
Favorable Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
SB 80
Favorable Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
SB 110
Favorable Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations
Top
Finance Committee Report No. 3
Distribution Date: January 19, 2018
Second Reading Date: January 22, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 38
Favorable with Amendments (2) Chair, Finance Committee
Motor Vehicle Administration and Local Health Departments - Birth and Death Certificates - Issuance of Copies
SB 87
Favorable with Amendments (2) Chair, Finance Committee
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
SB 108
Favorable Chair, Finance Committee
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Top
JANUARY 23, 2018 - SESSION 1
Finance Committee Report No. 4
Distribution Date: January 22, 2018
Second Reading Date: January 23, 2018
FAVORABLE
SB 6
Favorable Chair, Finance Committee
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
SB 67
Favorable Chair, Finance Committee
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
SB 78
Favorable with Amendments (1) Chair, Finance Committee
Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
SB 111
Favorable Chair, Finance Committee
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Top

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 20, 2018 5:30 AM