About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Addenda to Weekly Schedule Published October 18, 2018


October 19 October 22

Issued: October 19, 2018

FINANCIAL EDUCATION AND CAPABILITY COMMISSION - Addendum Number: 18-2

   MONDAY      OCTOBER 22, 2018

                                  10:00 A.M.     Harry Hughes
                                      to         Conference Room
                                  12:00 P.M.     Maryland Department of
                                                 Transportation Headquarters
                                                 7201 Corporate Center Drive
                                                 Hanover, MD

    Subject:  The Commission will learn about current trends in financial
              capability for Maryland's reentry population, and will finalize
              its 2018 recommendations.

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Holly Mirbella, CASH Campaign of Maryland
              Telephone: 443-302-9574

Issued: October 22, 2018

NEXT GENERATION 9-1-1 ACROSS MD, COMMISSION TO ADV - Addendum Number: 18-1

   TUESDAY     OCTOBER 23, 2018

                                  10:00 A.M.     Joint Hearing Room
                                      to         Dept. of Legislative Services
                                   4:00 P.M.     90 State Circle
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  State Commission Meeting

  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Claire Souhan, Office of Senator Cheryl
      Kagan
              Telephone: 410-841-3134
                         301-858-3134 (Washington, D.C. Area)



October 22, 2018 4:25 P.M.