About Schedules

The weekly schedule is issued anew each Thursday and includes the dates, times, locations, and topics for meetings being held by committees of the General Assembly and other state government groups. Addenda to the weekly schedule are published as necessary.

Meetings are generally held in late morning or early afternoon.

During the legislative session standing committee meetings include:

  • Public hearings on all assigned legislation. Withdrawn legislation does not always receive a hearing.
  • Briefings on subject matters as determined by the chair from agencies and selected organizations.
  • Receiving testimony from sponsors and other parties supporting or opposing legislation
  • Reviewing the Governor’s nominees to cabinet positions, certain Judgeships, and various boards and commissions (Senate Executive Nominations Committee only)
  • Hearing agency representatives discuss the budgets of specific units of State government (Budget Committees only)
  • Receiving proposed amendments
  • Voting to approve or reject legislation

Between sessions, scheduled meetings continue the work of General Assembly committees and its task forces, commissions, and special issue workgroups.

Certain committees webcast their meetings live and recordings can be listened to or viewed on demand after the meeting has concluded. Prior schedules and addenda are available online and in printed format.



Committee Schedules Index

april 27, 2017 schedule addenda
april 20, 2017 schedule addenda
april 13, 2017 schedule addenda
april 6, 2017 schedule addenda
march 30, 2017 schedule addenda
march 23, 2017 schedule addenda
march 16, 2017 schedule addenda
march 9, 2017 schedule addenda
march 2, 2017 schedule addenda
february 23, 2017 schedule addenda
february 16, 2017 schedule addenda
february 9, 2017 schedule addenda
february 2, 2017 schedule addenda
january 26, 2017 schedule addenda
january 19, 2017 schedule addenda
january 12, 2017 schedule addenda
january 5, 2017 schedule addenda
december 22, 2016 schedule addenda
december 15, 2016 schedule addenda
december 8, 2016 schedule addenda
december 1, 2016 schedule addenda
november 24, 2016 schedule addenda
november 17, 2016 schedule addenda
november 10, 2016 schedule addenda
november 3, 2016 schedule addenda
october 27, 2016 schedule addenda
october 20, 2016 schedule addenda
october 13, 2016 schedule addenda
october 6, 2016 schedule addenda
september 29, 2016 schedule addenda
september 22, 2016 schedule addenda
september 15, 2016 schedule addenda
september 8, 2016 schedule addenda
september 1, 2016 schedule addenda
august 25, 2016 schedule addenda
august 18, 2016 schedule addenda
august 11, 2016 schedule addenda
august 4, 2016 schedule addenda
july 28, 2016 schedule addenda
july 21, 2016 schedule addenda
july 14, 2016 schedule addenda
july 7, 2016 schedule addenda
june 30, 2016 schedule addenda
june 23, 2016 schedule addenda
june 16, 2016 schedule addenda
june 9, 2016 schedule addenda
june 2, 2016 schedule addenda
may 26, 2016 schedule addenda
may 19, 2016 schedule addenda
may 12, 2016 schedule addenda
may 5, 2016 schedule addenda
april 28, 2016 schedule addenda
april 21, 2016 schedule addenda
april 14, 2016 schedule addenda
april 7, 2016 schedule addenda
march 31, 2016 schedule addenda
march 24, 2016 schedule addenda
march 17, 2016 schedule addenda
march 10, 2016 schedule addenda
march 3, 2016 schedule addenda
february 25, 2016 schedule addenda
february 18, 2016 schedule addenda
february 11, 2016 schedule addenda
february 4, 2016 schedule addenda
january 28, 2016 schedule addenda
january 21, 2016 schedule addenda
january 14, 2016 schedule addenda
january 7, 2016 schedule addenda
december 24, 2015 schedule addenda
december 17, 2015 schedule addenda
december 10, 2015 schedule addenda
december 3, 2015 schedule addenda
november 26, 2015 schedule addenda
november 19, 2015 schedule addenda
november 12, 2015 schedule addenda
november 5, 2015 schedule addenda
october 29, 2015 schedule addenda
october 22, 2015 schedule addenda
october 15, 2015 schedule addenda
october 8, 2015 schedule addenda
october 1, 2015 schedule addenda
september 24, 2015 schedule addenda
september 17, 2015 schedule addenda
september 10, 2015 schedule addenda
september 3, 2015 schedule addenda
august 27, 2015 schedule addenda
august 20, 2015 schedule addenda
august 13, 2015 schedule addenda
august 6, 2015 schedule addenda
july 30, 2015 schedule addenda
july 23, 2015 schedule addenda
july 16, 2015 schedule addenda
july 9, 2015 schedule addenda
july 2, 2015 schedule addenda
june 25, 2015 schedule addenda
june 18, 2015 schedule addenda
june 11, 2015 schedule addenda
june 4, 2015 schedule addenda
may 28, 2015 schedule addenda
may 21, 2015 schedule addenda
may 14, 2015 schedule addenda
may 7, 2015 schedule addenda
april 30, 2015 schedule addenda
april 23, 2015 schedule addenda
april 16, 2015 schedule addenda
april 9, 2015 schedule addenda
april 2, 2015 schedule addenda
march 26, 2015 schedule addenda
march 19, 2015 schedule addenda
march 12, 2015 schedule addenda
march 5, 2015 schedule addenda
february 26, 2015 schedule addenda
february 19, 2015 schedule addenda
february 12, 2015 schedule addenda
february 5, 2015 schedule addenda
january 29, 2015 schedule addenda
january 22, 2015 schedule addenda
january 15, 2015 schedule addenda
january 8, 2015 schedule addenda
december 25, 2014 schedule addenda
december 18, 2014 schedule addenda
december 11, 2014 schedule addenda
december 4, 2014 schedule addenda
november 20, 2014 schedule addenda
november 13, 2014 schedule addenda
november 6, 2014 schedule addenda
october 30, 2014 schedule addenda
october 23, 2014 schedule addenda
october 16, 2014 schedule addenda
october 9, 2014 schedule addenda
october 2, 2014 schedule addenda
september 25, 2014 schedule addenda
september 18, 2014 schedule addenda
september 11, 2014 schedule addenda
september 4, 2014 schedule addenda
august 28, 2014 schedule addenda
august 21, 2014 schedule addenda
august 14, 2014 schedule addenda
august 7, 2014 schedule addenda
july 31, 2014 schedule addenda
july 24, 2014 schedule addenda
july 17, 2014 schedule addenda
july 10, 2014 schedule addenda
july 3, 2014 schedule addenda
june 26, 2014 schedule addenda
june 19, 2014 schedule addenda
june 12, 2014 schedule addenda
june 5, 2014 schedule addenda
may 29, 2014 schedule addenda
may 22, 2014 schedule addenda
may 15, 2014 schedule addenda
may 8, 2014 schedule addenda
may 1, 2014 schedule addenda
april 24, 2014 schedule addenda
april 17, 2014 schedule addenda
april 10, 2014 schedule addenda
april 3, 2014 schedule addenda
march 27, 2014 schedule addenda
march 20, 2014 schedule addenda
march 13, 2014 schedule addenda
march 6, 2014 schedule addenda
february 27, 2014 schedule addenda
february 20, 2014 schedule addenda
february 13, 2014 schedule addenda
february 6, 2014 schedule addenda
january 30, 2014 schedule addenda
january 23, 2014 schedule addenda
january 16, 2014 schedule addenda
january 9, 2014 schedule addenda
january 2, 2014 schedule addenda
december 19, 2013 schedule addenda
december 12, 2013 schedule addenda
december 5, 2013 schedule addenda
november 28, 2013 schedule addenda
november 21, 2013 schedule addenda
november 14, 2013 schedule addenda
november 7, 2013 schedule addenda
october 31, 2013 schedule addenda
october 24, 2013 schedule addenda
october 17, 2013 schedule addenda
october 10, 2013 schedule addenda
october 3, 2013 schedule addenda
september 26, 2013 schedule addenda
september 19, 2013 schedule addenda
september 12, 2013 schedule addenda
september 5, 2013 schedule addenda
august 29, 2013 schedule addenda
august 22, 2013 schedule addenda
august 15, 2013 schedule addenda
august 8, 2013 schedule addenda
august 1, 2013 schedule addenda
july 25, 2013 schedule addenda
july 18, 2013 schedule addenda
july 11, 2013 schedule addenda
july 4, 2013 schedule addenda
june 27, 2013 schedule addenda
june 20, 2013 schedule addenda
june 13, 2013 schedule addenda
june 6, 2013 schedule addenda
may 30, 2013 schedule addenda
may 23, 2013 schedule addenda
may 16, 2013 schedule addenda
may 9, 2013 schedule addenda
may 2, 2013 schedule addenda
april 25, 2013 schedule addenda
april 18, 2013 schedule addenda
april 11, 2013 schedule addenda
april 4, 2013 schedule addenda
march 28, 2013 schedule addenda
march 21, 2013 schedule addenda
march 14, 2013 schedule addenda
march 7, 2013 schedule addenda
february 28, 2013 schedule addenda
february 21, 2013 schedule addenda
february 14, 2013 schedule addenda
february 7, 2013 schedule addenda
january 31, 2013 schedule addenda
january 24, 2013 schedule addenda
january 17, 2013 schedule addenda
january 10, 2013 schedule addenda
january 3, 2013 schedule addenda
december 20, 2012 schedule addenda
december 13, 2012 schedule addenda
december 6, 2012 schedule addenda
november 29, 2012 schedule addenda
november 22, 2012 schedule addenda



April 28, 2017 3:58 P.M.