Capital Budget Facts

    Legislative Appropriation
  • Fiscal Year 2018:
     Total Funds: $4.579 billion
     General Obligation Bonds:
         $1.089 billion
     Transportation: $2.636 billion
     Academic Bonds: $32.0 million
     Maryland Department of the    Environment Revenue Bonds:
         $349.1 million
     Qualified Zone Academy Bonds:
          $4.83 million
     Pay-As-You-Go: $491.8 million
  • Total Debt Outstanding
         (6/30/18 estimate): $9.486
         billion
     Debt Outstanding as % of
         Personal Income (4% Limit):
         3.54%
     Debt Service as a % of
         State Revenues (8% Limit):
         7.77%

Related Links

Capital Budget:

Fiscal Briefing

View Budget Hearings:

  • Senate Committees View Senate Committee Hearings icon
  • House Committees View House Committee Hearings icon

Bond Bill Submissions:

Prior Authorizations:

Budget Analysts:

Highlighted:



Operating - Fiscal Year 2018


SubjectDLS Analysis by AgencyBudget CodeHouse Hearing DateSenate Hearing Date
Education - Education Other Maryland State Department of EducationRA01*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Education - School Construction Public School Construction ProgramDE0202*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Environment - Agriculture Maryland Department of AgricultureLA11*
2/15/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/14/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Environment - Energy Maryland Energy AdministrationDA13*
2/15/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/14/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Environment - Environment Maryland Department of the EnvironmentUA01*
2/22/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/21/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Environment - MD Env. Services Maryland Environmental ServiceUB00*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Environment - Natural Resources Department of Natural ResourcesKA05*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Health/Social - Health Other Department of AgingDA07*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Department of Health and Mental HygieneMA01*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Health/Social - Health State Facilities Department of Juvenile ServicesV00*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Health/Social - Private Hospitals Maryland Hospital AssociationZA01*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Prince George's Hospital SystemZA00R*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of Maryland Medical SystemRQ00*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Higher Education - Community Colleges Community College Facilities Grant ProgramRI00*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Higher Education - Morgan State Univ. Morgan State UniversityRM00*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Higher Education - Private Colleges/Universities Maryland Independent College and University AssociationZA00NOP*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Higher Education - St. Marys College St Mary's College of MarylandRD00*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Higher Education - University System Coppin State UniversityRB27*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Frostburg State UniversityRB26*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Towson UniversityRB24*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of BaltimoreRB28*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of Maryland Eastern ShoreRB25*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of Maryland, BaltimoreRB21*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of Maryland, Baltimore CountyRB31*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University of Maryland, College ParkRB22*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
University System of Maryland OfficeRB36*
3/13/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Housing and Community Development - Housing Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentSA00*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Housing and Community Development - Housing Other Department of PlanningDW0110*
2/15/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/14/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Local Projects - Local Project Administration Miscellaneous Grant ProgramZA00*
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Play Video
3/13/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Play Audio
Other Capital Fiscal BriefingCAP01*
2/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Play Video
2/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Public Safety - Local Jails Local Jails and Detention CentersZB02*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Public Safety - State Corrections Department of Public Safety and Correctional ServicesQ0*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Public Safety - State Police Department of State PoliceWA00*
3/7/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
3/15/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
Play Audio
State Facilities - State Facilities Other Board of Public WorksDE0201*
3/8/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Play Video
3/7/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Department of DisabilitiesDA0201*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Department of Information TechnologyFB04*
2/22/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/21/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Department of Veterans AffairsD55P*
2/15/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/14/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
JudiciaryDE0211*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Maryland Public Broadcasting CommissionRP00*
3/1/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio
Military DepartmentDH0104*
2/22/2017 - 4:30 p.m.
Play Video
2/21/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Play Audio