Recent Publication Information

Budget publications created for the fiscal year are organized into the following categories:

"Operating Budget" publications analyze and summarize the state's operating budget, excluding the analysis documents.

"Operating Budget - Analysis Only" publications analyze and summarize the state's operating budget, analysis documents only.

"Capital Budget" publications analyze and summarize the state's capital budget, excluding the analysis documents.

"Capital Budget - Analysis Only" publications analyze and summarize the state's capital budget, analysis documents only.

"Shared Operating and Capital Budget" includes publications that apply to both budgets.

"Spending Affordability" includes publications that have been presented to or produced by the committee.

"Other" budget related publications.


Publications - Fiscal Year 2019





Budget & Fiscal - Operating ▾Published
2018 - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 (SB187/HB161) - Budget Summary, Provisions, and RecommendationsBudget Reconciliation and Financing Act - Budget Summary, Provisions, and Recommendations02/28/2018
2018 - Conference Committee Summary Report on SB185 - the Budget Bill and SB187 - the Budget Reconciliation and Financing ActThis document provides summary information on the status of the general fund budget, budget growth, expenditures by major category for each fund, and an updated fiscal note on the budget bill.03/27/2018
2018 - Fiscal Briefing - January 22, 2018This overview of the budget and other significant fiscal issues is presented to the legislative committees by the Office of Policy Analysis shortly after the Governor's introduction of the budget.01/22/2018
2018 - House Appropriations Committee - Report on SB185 - the Budget Bill and House Bill 152 - the Budget Reconciliation and Financing ActA summary report which provides information on the status of the general fund, spending affordability, and other important issues.03/19/2018
2018 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of SB185 - (Budget Bill FY2019)House committee reprint of the budget bill which contains the committee amendments.03/19/2018
2018 - House Appropriations Committee Reprint of SB187 - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018House committee reprint of the Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act which contains the committee amendments.03/19/2018
2018 - Joint Chairmen's Report - Report on the Fiscal 2019 State Operating Budget (SB185) and the State Capital Budget (SB186) and Related RecommendationsThis report, by the chairs of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Appropriations Committee, incorporates detailed statements of all legislative reductions made to the operating and capital appropriations and includes narrative that expresses legislative intent and policy guidelines relative to the action taken.04/25/2018
2018 - Report of the Conference Committee - Report on Senate Bill 185 - The Budget Bill (FY2019)This is the report of the budget conference committee, which is composed of five members from each house, who meet to reconcile the differences between the Senate and House versions of the budget bill.03/27/2018
2018 - Report of the House Appropriations Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to SB185 (Budget Bill FY2019)Report from the House Appropriations Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the governor's budget bill.03/19/2018
2018 - Report of the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Recommendations, Reductions and Summary of Action Pertaining to SB185 (Budget Bill FY2019)Report from the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee with recommendations, reductions and summary of action pertaining to the governor's budget bill.03/12/2018
2018 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee - Report on SB185 - the Budget BillA summary report which provides information on the status of the general fund, spending affordability, and other important issues.03/12/2018
2018 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of SB185 - (Budget Bill FY2019)Senate committee reprint of the budget bill which contains the committee amendments.03/12/2018
2018 - Senate Budget and Taxation Committee Reprint of SB187 - Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018Senate committee reprint of the Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act which contains the committee amendments.03/12/2018
2018 - Supplemental Budget No. 1 - Fiscal Year 2019The Constitution of Maryland provides that the Governor may amend or supplement the budget, with the consent of the General Assembly, before final action on the budget bill.03/06/2018
2018 - Supplemental Budget No. 2 - Fiscal Year 2019The Constitution of Maryland provides that the Governor may amend or supplement the budget, with the consent of the General Assembly, before final action on the budget bill.03/23/2018
2018 - Supplemental Budget No. 3 - Fiscal Year 2019The Constitution of Maryland provides that the Governor may amend or supplement the budget, with the consent of the General Assembly, before final action on the budget bill.03/23/2018